if

08+08 = 32 09+09 = 36 10+10 = 04 11+11 = 08

then

15+15 = ?

sum of all one digit numbers multiplied by 2 so ans should be 24.

If no is less than 10, then the answer will be sum of double of each number .Otherwise, the answer will be double of sum of each digit of the two numbers. So, in this case the answer will be

(6 + 6) * 2 = 24

If 51 x 51 = 26 01 52 x 52 = 27 04 53 x 53 = 28 09 54 x 54 = 29 16 55 x 55 = 30 25 56 x 56 = 31 36 then 57 x 57 = ?? ??

If 111 = 09 444 = 12 777 = 15 Then 888 = ???